NY S01324 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-16 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-16 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the upstate flood mitigation task force within the canal corporation; establishes the upstate flood mitigation fund to conduct studies on the impact of floods and on preventative or mitigation measures.
Title
Creates the upstate flood mitigation task force within the canal corporation; establishes the upstate flood mitigation fund to conduct studies on the impact of floods and on preventative or mitigation measures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1324A |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1599 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06716 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6754