NY A06716 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6754
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6754
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the upstate flood mitigation task force and grant program within the canal corporation to conduct studies on the impact of floods and on preventative or mitigation measures.
Title
Creates the upstate flood mitigation task force and grant program within the canal corporation to conduct studies on the impact of floods and on preventative or mitigation measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6754 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.491 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.491 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | print number 6716b |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | print number 6716a |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S01324 (Same As) 2018-01-16 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06754 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - SIGNED CHAP.448
S06754 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - SIGNED CHAP.448