NY S01291 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to claims for loss or damage to real property; creates continuing education requirements for licensed persons and qualifications for public and independent adjusters; allows for a revocation of licenses with an opportunity to reapply for such licenses.
Title
Relates to claims for loss or damage to real property; creates continuing education requirements for licensed persons and qualifications for public and independent adjusters; allows for a revocation of licenses with an opportunity to reapply for such licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.569 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |