NY S01246 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to prohibitions on circus performances; prohibits circuses from conducting shows or other performances in the state for two years where a circus has been found to be in violation or in non-compliance with the Animal Welfare Act of 1966.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to prohibitions on circus performances; prohibits circuses from conducting shows or other performances in the state for two years where a circus has been found to be in violation or in non-compliance with the Animal Welfare Act of 1966.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-17SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2016-05-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2016-05-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2016-04-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.602
2016-01-06SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2015-01-09SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A00637 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to economic development

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback