NY S01232 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares a policy of equal treatment of people of all races, cultures, religions, incomes, education levels, disabilities, gender identity/expression and sexual preference in the development and enforcement of environmental laws, regulations and policies.
Title
Declares a policy of equal treatment of people of all races, cultures, religions, incomes, education levels, disabilities, gender identity/expression and sexual preference in the development and enforcement of environmental laws, regulations and policies.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Gianaris [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2022-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.770 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2021-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.974 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09057 (Same As) 2022-01-31 - referred to environmental conservation