NY S01232 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes constitutional provision that the lieutenant-governor shall act as governor when the governor is absent from the state; also provides likewise for the case in which the lieutenant-governor is absent from the state and the case in which the temporary president of the senate is absent from the state.
Title
Removes constitutional provision that the lieutenant-governor shall act as governor when the governor is absent from the state; also provides likewise for the case in which the lieutenant-governor is absent from the state and the case in which the temporary president of the senate is absent from the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-12 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-02-10 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-01-13 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01979 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in governmental operations