NY S01228 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 1228A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 1228A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all set top boxes provided by cable, satellite, telecom and internet service providers to comply with energy star guidelines by 7/1/2017.
Title
Requires all set top boxes provided by cable, satellite, telecom and internet service providers to comply with energy star guidelines by 7/1/2017.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1228A |
2012-01-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2011-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |