NY S01217 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2653
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits the court to grant post-conviction motions to vacate a judgment when the issue raised upon such motion is ineffective assistance of counsel in certain cases in which the court would otherwise be required to deny the motion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits the court to grant post-conviction motions to vacate a judgment when the issue raised upon such motion is ineffective assistance of counsel in certain cases in which the court would otherwise be required to deny the motion.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A2653
2021-05-24SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-05-20Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-05-19Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1214
2021-01-08SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A02653 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback