NY S01187 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the imposition of different premium rates for disability insurance based on gender.
Title
Prohibits the imposition of different premium rates for disability insurance based on gender.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2022-03-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-28 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1187A |
2022-02-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.346 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-03-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.223 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06642 (Same As) 2022-03-17 - print number 6642a