NY A06642 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - print number 6642a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - print number 6642a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the imposition of different premium rates for disability insurance based on gender.
Title
Prohibits the imposition of different premium rates for disability insurance based on gender.
Sponsors
Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Robert Carroll [D] | Asm. Phara Souffrant Forrest [D] |
Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Brian Barnwell [D] | Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Assembly | print number 6642a |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S01187 (Same As) 2022-03-08 - referred to insurance