NY S01172 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.140
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.140
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Middletown-Hardenburgh fire district and makes technical changes.
Title
Relates to the Middletown-Hardenburgh fire district and makes technical changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.140 |
2015-08-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.489 |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a5403 |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2015-03-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-03-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-26 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2015-02-10 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1172A |
2015-01-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.18 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05403 (Same As) 2015-06-01 - substituted by s1172a