NY S01169 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - PRINT NUMBER 1169A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - PRINT NUMBER 1169A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the clinical trial access and education fund to provide grants to eligible applicants to provide certain services for patients with life-threatening or disabling conditions or diseases.
Title
Establishes the clinical trial access and education fund to provide grants to eligible applicants to provide certain services for patients with life-threatening or disabling conditions or diseases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1169A |
2022-05-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-02-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-05-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00180 (Same As) 2022-04-29 - print number 180a