NY S01129 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to hunting in the county of Broome west of the Susquehanna river.
Title
Relates to hunting in the county of Broome west of the Susquehanna river.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.125 |
2017-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.377 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a2996a |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1691 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1129A |
2017-06-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02996 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - substituted by s1129a