NY S01121 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - APPROVAL MEMO.25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a state information technology innovation center or iCenter to develop and demonstrate technology solutions with potential benefit to the state and its citizens; facilitates the piloting of potential solutions to state technology requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a state information technology innovation center or iCenter to develop and demonstrate technology solutions with potential benefit to the state and its citizens; facilitates the piloting of potential solutions to state technology requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.25
2017-11-29AssemblySIGNED CHAP.427
2017-11-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.526
2017-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a1713a
2017-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-19AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenateREPASSED SENATE
2017-06-14SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1121A
2017-06-14SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2017-06-14Senatereturned to senate
2017-06-14AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2017-04-26Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2017-04-26SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-04-26SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-02-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-02-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-02-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.172
2017-01-06SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A01713 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s1121a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01121&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01121&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01121
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01121&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01121A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S1121#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S1121#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S1121#SF2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01121&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback