NY S01093 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-02 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-02 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes deer management professionals retained by the incorporated village of Lloyd Harbor, or the incorporated village of Upper Brookville from the hunting rifle ban on Long Island.
Title
Excludes deer management professionals retained by the incorporated village of Lloyd Harbor, or the incorporated village of Upper Brookville from the hunting rifle ban on Long Island.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2022-05-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.733 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2021-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.973 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1093A |
2021-03-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07641 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - held for consideration in environmental conservation