NY S01082 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-15 - DEFEATED IN CODES
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-15 - DEFEATED IN CODES
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Decriminalizes the possession and sale of hypodermic needles and syringes; regulates the sale of hypodermic needles and syringes.
Title
Decriminalizes the possession and sale of hypodermic needles and syringes; regulates the sale of hypodermic needles and syringes.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | DEFEATED IN CODES |
2018-03-19 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-04-25 | Senate | DEFEATED IN CODES |
2017-03-13 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06258 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.442