NY S01027 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the canvassing of absentee, military and special ballots and ballots cast in affidavit envelopes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the canvassing of absentee, military and special ballots and ballots cast in affidavit envelopes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-06-10Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.737
2021-06-10Assemblysubstituted for a7931
2021-06-09Assemblyreferred to election law
2021-06-09AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-09SenateREPASSED SENATE
2021-06-01SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1027A
2021-06-01SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2021-06-01Senatereturned to senate
2021-06-01AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2021-01-11Assemblyreferred to election law
2021-01-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-01-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-01-11SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.8
2021-01-11SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A01052 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - substituted by s614b
A07931 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s1027a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback