NY S00978 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to parking spaces for handicapped persons; provides that the commissioner of motor vehicles shall provide in any pre-licensing course a mandatory component of education of the laws relating to handicapped accessible parking.
Title
Relates to parking spaces for handicapped persons; provides that the commissioner of motor vehicles shall provide in any pre-licensing course a mandatory component of education of the laws relating to handicapped accessible parking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.490 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 978A |
2020-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-02-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.50 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09120 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - referred to transportation