NY S00955 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York State fair pay act"; provides that it shall be an unlawful employment practice for an employer to discriminate between employees on the basis of sex, race and/or national origin by paying different wages.
Title
Enacts the "New York State fair pay act"; provides that it shall be an unlawful employment practice for an employer to discriminate between employees on the basis of sex, race and/or national origin by paying different wages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO LABOR | |
2009-04-06 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2009-01-22 | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A3911 (Same As) 2010-04-19 - REFERRED TO LABOR