NY S00938 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the veteran career assistance program within the SUNY and CUNY systems.
Title
Establishes the veteran career assistance program within the SUNY and CUNY systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2018-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.297 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-01-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.48 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A04755 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to higher education