NY S00888 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - SIGNED CHAP.84
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - SIGNED CHAP.84
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the statutory short form and other powers of attorney for purposes of financial and estate planning.
Title
Relates to the statutory short form and other powers of attorney for purposes of financial and estate planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.84 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.103 |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | substituted for a2353 |
2021-01-20 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-01-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-01-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.41 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A02353 (Same As) 2021-02-23 - substituted by s888