NY S00877 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 877A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 877A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits providers of health care coverage from requiring behavioral health providers to provide all products offered by the health care plan.
Title
Prohibits providers of health care coverage from requiring behavioral health providers to provide all products offered by the health care plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. George Amedore [R] | Sen. John Bonacic [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 877A |
2018-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-03-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00023 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - REFERRED TO HEALTH