NY A00023 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits providers of health care coverage from requiring behavioral health providers to provide all products offered by the health care plan.
Title
Prohibits providers of health care coverage from requiring behavioral health providers to provide all products offered by the health care plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.3 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.79 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.79 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00877 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 877A