NY S00844 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A971
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A971
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires when delivery is made of liquefied petroleum gas in times of emergency the temporary emergency supplier shall provide written information to the regular supplier; prohibits removing or filling liquefied petroleum gas without consent of the owner.
Title
Requires when delivery is made of liquefied petroleum gas in times of emergency the temporary emergency supplier shall provide written information to the regular supplier; prohibits removing or filling liquefied petroleum gas without consent of the owner.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A971 |
2023-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.53 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00971 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - signed chap.28