NY S00842 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - SIGNED CHAP.85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - SIGNED CHAP.85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes clarifying changes to the exemption of real property of an applicable battery park city property from payments in lieu of taxes (PILOT).
Title
Makes clarifying changes to the exemption of real property of an applicable battery park city property from payments in lieu of taxes (PILOT).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.85 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-02-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-02-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-02-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.77 |
2023-02-01 | Assembly | substituted for a2353 |
2023-01-24 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2023-01-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-01-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.51 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A02353 (Same As) 2023-02-01 - substituted by s842