NY S00842 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires police accident reports to indicate whether a mobile phone was in use at the time of such vehicle accident.
Title
Requires police accident reports to indicate whether a mobile phone was in use at the time of such vehicle accident.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.676 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1052 |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01149 (Same As) 2012-04-18 - reported referred to codes