NY S00785 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the governor to fill vacancy in the office of lieutenant-governor on confirmation of both houses of the legislature; allows the governor to leave the state without transmitting power to lieutenant-governor and establishes the process for lieutenant-governor to act as governor during incapacitation of the governor.
Title
Authorizes the governor to fill vacancy in the office of lieutenant-governor on confirmation of both houses of the legislature; allows the governor to leave the state without transmitting power to lieutenant-governor and establishes the process for lieutenant-governor to act as governor during incapacitation of the governor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-07 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-01-11 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |