NY S00775 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enables veterans to receive benefit information upon applying for or renewing a driver's license.
Title
Enables veterans to receive benefit information upon applying for or renewing a driver's license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.405 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 775A |
2016-01-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.523 |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00122 (Same As) 2016-03-04 - print number 122a