NY S00770 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-13 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-13 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Subtracts from federal adjusted gross income qualified transportation fringe benefits.
Title
Subtracts from federal adjusted gross income qualified transportation fringe benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 770B |
2013-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.646 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 770A |
2013-05-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2013-04-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02766 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means