NY S00761 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the forest ranger force to establish a training program for volunteer search and rescue personnel to assist the forest rangers in wild, remote and forested areas of the state.
Title
Authorizes the forest ranger force to establish a training program for volunteer search and rescue personnel to assist the forest rangers in wild, remote and forested areas of the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Little [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2018-02-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-28 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.533 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2017-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.261 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09756 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - referred to environmental conservation