NY S00699 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the birds and bees protection act; prohibits the sale of certain pesticides or use of seeds coated with such pesticides; requires the department of environmental conservation to review the latest scientific information concerning certain pesticide active ingredients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the birds and bees protection act; prohibits the sale of certain pesticides or use of seeds coated with such pesticides; requires the department of environmental conservation to review the latest scientific information concerning certain pesticide active ingredients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-03SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2022-05-23SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 699D
2022-05-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2022-05-04Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2022-05-03Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1035
2022-04-25SenatePRINT NUMBER 699C
2022-04-25SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2022-01-05SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2022-01-05Assemblyreturned to senate
2022-01-05Assemblydied in assembly
2021-06-08Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2021-06-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1617
2021-06-08SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2021-04-22SenatePRINT NUMBER 699B
2021-04-22SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2021-03-03SenatePRINT NUMBER 699A
2021-03-03SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A07429 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S699
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00699&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00699
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00699&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00699A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00699&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00699B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00699&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00699C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00699&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00699D
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S699#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S699#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S699#SC2

Bill Comments

feedback