NY S00695 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of electronic cigarettes to minors; prohibits distribution or sale of any item containing or delivering nicotine that is not defined by law as a tobacco product or approved by the United States food and drug administration for sale as a tobacco use cessation or harm reduction product.
Title
Prohibits the sale of electronic cigarettes to minors; prohibits distribution or sale of any item containing or delivering nicotine that is not defined by law as a tobacco product or approved by the United States food and drug administration for sale as a tobacco use cessation or harm reduction product.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01468 (Same As) 2012-02-24 - enacting clause stricken