NY S00664 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including information concerning repayment of outstanding loans in the standard financial aid award letter.
Title
Relates to including information concerning repayment of outstanding loans in the standard financial aid award letter.
Sponsors
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. John Mannion [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2022-05-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.213 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2021-03-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.431 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A05601 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to banks