NY S00620 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the hunting or taking of wildlife with the aid of an unmanned aerial vehicle.
Title
Prohibits the hunting or taking of wildlife with the aid of an unmanned aerial vehicle.
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.444 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02525 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation