NY S00571 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-06 - APPROVAL MEMO.19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-06 - APPROVAL MEMO.19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows businesses to use funds received from the minority- and women-owned business development and lending program for the purpose of refinancing existing debt.
Title
Allows businesses to use funds received from the minority- and women-owned business development and lending program for the purpose of refinancing existing debt.
Sponsors
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. John Mannion [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-06 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.19 |
2022-10-06 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.568 |
2022-10-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.402 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | substituted for a6420 |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2022-02-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-02-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.326 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2021-03-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.319 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06420 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - substituted by s571