NY A06420 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s571
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s571
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows businesses to use funds received from the minority- and women-owned business development and lending program for the purpose of refinancing existing debt.
Title
Allows businesses to use funds received from the minority- and women-owned business development and lending program for the purpose of refinancing existing debt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s571 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.402 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S00571 (Same As) 2022-10-06 - APPROVAL MEMO.19