NY S00549 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3954B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3954B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the local food, farms, and jobs act; relates to the procurement of locally grown farm and food products; creates the New York state council on food policy.
Title
Enacts the local food, farms, and jobs act; relates to the procurement of locally grown farm and food products; creates the New York state council on food policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3954B |
2022-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.583 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 549B |
2022-01-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2021-03-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | AMENDED 549A |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.455 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A03954 (Same As) 2022-11-23 - approval memo.29