NY S00491 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for financial disclosure by employees of state operated campus foundations, including the Research Foundation of the State University of New York.
Title
Provides for financial disclosure by employees of state operated campus foundations, including the Research Foundation of the State University of New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1318 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05949 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to higher education