NY S00481 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires applicants for public assistance to be fully informed, orally and in writing, that they may be liable to reimburse the state for benefits received; requires an informed acknowledgment form to be signed by the applicant and kept in the applicant's file.
Title
Requires applicants for public assistance to be fully informed, orally and in writing, that they may be liable to reimburse the state for benefits received; requires an informed acknowledgment form to be signed by the applicant and kept in the applicant's file.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.663 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 481A |
2016-01-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2015-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1129 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A02942 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - ordered to third reading rules cal.386