NY A02942 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - ordered to third reading rules cal.386
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - ordered to third reading rules cal.386
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires applicants for public assistance to be given notice in writing, that they may be liable to reimburse the state for benefits received; provides such notice shall be given as part of an informational booklet and as a standalone document.
Title
Requires applicants for public assistance to be given notice in writing, that they may be liable to reimburse the state for benefits received; provides such notice shall be given as part of an informational booklet and as a standalone document.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.386 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.386 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | print number 2942b |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | print number 2942a |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to social services |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2015-01-20 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S00481 (Same As) 2016-06-01 - referred to codes