NY S00480 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing the New York state prescription medication cost containment program.
Title
Relates to establishing the New York state prescription medication cost containment program.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2011-03-23 | Senate | DEFEATED IN CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2011-02-22 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01098 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to governmental employees