NY S00439 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - DEFEATED IN CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - DEFEATED IN CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a kitchen incubator/shared-use kitchen facility program within the urban development corporation; provides grant funding to local development corporations, municipalities, educational institutions and not-for-profit entities for the development or expansion of kitchen incubator/shared-use kitchen facilities which make available services such as food production, technical assistance, business management and marketing, distribution, storage and retailing assistance, particularly in economically distressed areas.
Title
Establishes a kitchen incubator/shared-use kitchen facility program within the urban development corporation; provides grant funding to local development corporations, municipalities, educational institutions and not-for-profit entities for the development or expansion of kitchen incubator/shared-use kitchen facilities which make available services such as food production, technical assistance, business management and marketing, distribution, storage and retailing assistance, particularly in economically distressed areas.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Senate | DEFEATED IN CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2012-02-21 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |