NY S00427 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a person shall be guilty of aggravated unlicensed operation of a motor vehicle in the second degree when such person commits the offense of aggravated unlicensed operation of a motor vehicle in the third degree and has in effect two or more suspensions, rather than three or more suspensions, for failure to answer, appear or pay a fine in certain instances.
Title
Provides that a person shall be guilty of aggravated unlicensed operation of a motor vehicle in the second degree when such person commits the offense of aggravated unlicensed operation of a motor vehicle in the third degree and has in effect two or more suspensions, rather than three or more suspensions, for failure to answer, appear or pay a fine in certain instances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1202 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-05-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.152 |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05528 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to transportation