NY S00410 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2015 - 50% progression
Action: 2016-02-24 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the maximum fine for the misdemeanor of abandonment of animals to $2,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the maximum fine for the misdemeanor of abandonment of animals to $2,000.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-24Assemblyreferred to agriculture
2016-02-24SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2016-02-24SenatePASSED SENATE
2016-02-02SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2016-02-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2016-01-26Senate1ST REPORT CAL.73
2016-01-06SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
2016-01-06Assemblyreturned to senate
2016-01-06Assemblydied in assembly
2015-06-03Assemblyreferred to agriculture
2015-06-03SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2015-06-03SenatePASSED SENATE
2015-05-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2015-05-06Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2015-05-05Senate1ST REPORT CAL.514
2015-01-07SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE

Same As/Similar To

A02894 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to agriculture

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback