NY S00405 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the right of tenants to call police or emergency assistance without fear of losing their housing as the result of landlord actions or local nuisance laws.
Title
Establishes the right of tenants to call police or emergency assistance without fear of losing their housing as the result of landlord actions or local nuisance laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02919 (Same As) 2018-04-23 - REFERRED TO CODES