NY S00403 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 403A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 403A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a distinctive plate honoring the Boy Scouts of America for which the regular registration fee will apply plus an initial one time service charge of $25.
Title
Establishes a distinctive plate honoring the Boy Scouts of America for which the regular registration fee will apply plus an initial one time service charge of $25.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Sen. James Seward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 403A |
2018-01-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.691 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04424 (Same As) 2018-01-31 - print number 4424a