NY A04424 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - print number 4424a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - print number 4424a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a distinctive plate honoring the Boy Scouts of America for which the regular registration fee will apply plus an initial one time service charge of $25.
Title
Establishes a distinctive plate honoring the Boy Scouts of America for which the regular registration fee will apply plus an initial one time service charge of $25.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Assembly | print number 4424a |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00403 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 403A