NY S00370 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a biodiesel grant program for the agricultural production of biodiesel fuel; defines biodiesel fuel as a fuel comprised of mono-alkyl esters of long chain fatty acids derived from vegetable oils or animal fats, designated B100, and meeting the requirements of the American Society of Testing and Materials designation of D 6751; establishes the biodiesel grant program fund.
Title
Establishes a biodiesel grant program for the agricultural production of biodiesel fuel; defines biodiesel fuel as a fuel comprised of mono-alkyl esters of long chain fatty acids derived from vegetable oils or animal fats, designated B100, and meeting the requirements of the American Society of Testing and Materials designation of D 6751; establishes the biodiesel grant program fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 370B |
2018-01-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1255 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-02-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 370A |
2017-02-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02013 (Same As) 2018-01-25 - print number 2013a