NY S00367 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for adjusted homestead and non-homestead adjusted base proportions in assessing real estate taxes in the town of Colonie for the 2009 assessment roll.
Title
Provides for adjusted homestead and non-homestead adjusted base proportions in assessing real estate taxes in the town of Colonie for the 2009 assessment roll.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-02-02 | PRINT NUMBER 367A | |
2009-02-02 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-01-07 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A00809 (Same As) 2010-01-20 - committed to real property taxation