NY S00309 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the establishment of emergency management release plans to be developed for use in correctional facilities in the event of a state disaster emergency declared pursuant to executive order; establishes an advisory board to provide recommendations for the development of such plans; establishes criteria to be used to determine eligibility for emergency release of incarcerated individuals.
Title
Relates to the establishment of emergency management release plans to be developed for use in correctional facilities in the event of a state disaster emergency declared pursuant to executive order; establishes an advisory board to provide recommendations for the development of such plans; establishes criteria to be used to determine eligibility for emergency release of incarcerated individuals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2024-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | AMENDED 309B |
2024-03-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.581 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 309A |
2024-02-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09449 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - referred to correction